judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TAMBERELLA (JOSEPH) VS. STATE

Case Information: 47873
Short Caption:TAMBERELLA (JOSEPH) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C214619Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/18/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/18/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 06-17275
08/18/2006Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 9/1/05, 11/10/05, 1/3/06, 1/10/06, 1/19/06, 6/15/06 and 6/22/06. Court Reporters: Sharon Howard, Cheryl Gardner, Thelma Stapley, Carlaya Lewis and Angela Lee. Filed in district court on: August 14, 2006. 06-17276
08/24/2006TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: June 15, 2006. Court Reporter: Carlaya Lewis. 06-17633
08/24/2006TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 1/3/06 and 1/10/06. Court Reporter: Cheryl Gardner. 06-17636
09/11/2006TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 9/1/05 and 11/10/05. Court Reporter: Sharon Howard. 06-18734
09/25/2006MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 06-19629
10/09/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Court reporters or recorders Gina Shrader and Angela Lee shall file the requested transcripts within 10 days of this order. The motion for an extension of time is granted. Appellant shall have 20 days from the filing of the transcripts within which to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix. 06-20601
10/23/2006TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 06/22/06. Court Reporter: Angela Lee. 06-21812
11/27/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Court reporter Gina Shrader shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file the transcript or show cause why she should not be sanctioned. 06-24127
01/05/2007Order/CounselFiled Order/Sanctions. On November 27, 2006, this court again ordered Gina Shrader to file the transcript or show cause why she should not be sanctioned. Shrader has once again failed to file the transcript. We conclude that the imposition of a monetary sanction is appropriate. Shrader shall personally pay the sum of one hundred dollars ($100.00) to the Supreme Court Law Library and provide the clerk of this court with an affidavit or certificate verifying that payment has been made within 20 days of the date of this order. Shrader shall file and serve the transcript within 10 days of this order or show cause why she should not be sanctioned further. 07-00346
01/23/2007TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 1/19/06 & 1/26/06. Court Reporter: Gina M. Shrader. 07-01724
02/22/2007TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 1/19/06 and 1/26/06. Court Reporter: Gina Shrader. 07-04287
03/28/2007TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 1/19/06 & 1/26/06. Court Reporter: Gina M. Shrader. 07-07056
07/17/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, no fast track statement has been filed. Fast track statement and appendix due: 10 days or show cause why counsel for appellant should not be sanctioned. 07-15540
07/26/2007MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 07-16433
07/30/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Motion Granted in Part. in Part. Fast Track Statement due: 20 days. Counsel cautioned. 07-16639
08/23/2007Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 07-18716
08/23/2007AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 07-18717
08/29/2007Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 07-19154
11/16/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP08-JH/RP/MD. 07-24965
12/03/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Court Reporter Shrader shall have 20 days to provide proof of payment of sanction or show cause whey she should not be santioned further. 07-26000
12/12/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 07-26383
12/12/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/21/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 17, 2007. 07-26383
01/22/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. within 10 days of the date of this order, Shrader shall pay $100 to the Supreme Court Law Library and provide the clerk of this court with proof of payment of the sanction or file a written response explaining why she should not be sanctioned further 08-01551
03/27/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. to Appear. Court reporter Gina Shrader shall appear personally before this court on April 17, 2008, at 11:30 a.m., in Las Vegas. Shrader shall be prepared to show cause why she should not be held in contempt. Any evidence which Shrader desires to present on her bahalf shall be filed in affidavit form on or before Friday, April 9, 2008. Transcript (March 21, 2006) in 47687 due: 10 days. Overdue sanctions due: 20 days. We refer Shrader to the Certified Court Reporters' Board of Nevada for investigation. Nos. 47687/47873 (08-07545).
04/14/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. to Appear. Nos. 47668/47873. 08-09270
04/15/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the affidavits and accompanying documents that were attached to the motion for an extension of time. Nos. 47687/47873. 08-09344
04/15/2008Notice/IncomingFiled Affidavit. Two affidavits with attachments from court reporter Gina Shrader. Nos. 47687/47873. 08-09364
04/17/2008Other Other. Pursuant to the Order to Appear filed 3/27/08, court reporter Gina Shrader personally appeared before the court after oral arguments in Las Vegas. SNP08--JH/RP/MD
04/23/2008Notice/IncomingFiled Affidavit. Affidavit of Gina M. Shrader (court reporter). Proof of payment of sanction. 08-10178
05/20/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. . We conclude that no further sanctions are warranted at this time. We caution court reporter Gina Shrader, however, that we expect her to timely file requeststed transcripts. Shrader shall timely respond to orders of this court. Nos. 47687/47873 08-12697