judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GILLEN VS. D'AMICO

Case Information: 47854
Short Caption:GILLEN VS. D'AMICOCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 0500521AClassification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/28/2007How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/16/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived. FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS REVOKED SEE 11/18/06 ORDER.
08/16/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) 06-17116
08/29/2006Transcript RequestFiled Civil Proper Person Transcript Request Form. 06-17946
08/29/2006BriefFiled Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. 06-17948
09/15/2006MotionFiled Motion. Respondent's Motion to Revoke Appellant's in Forma Pauperis Status. 06-19051
09/21/2006MotionFiled Proper Person Response. Response to Respondent Motion to Revoke Appellant Forma Pauperis. 06-19454
10/05/2006Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Request for Information from Both Clerks, Alan Glover and Janette M. Bloom. 06-20434
10/16/2006Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Request for Information from Both Clerks, Alan Glover and Janette M. Bloom. 06-21220
10/18/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion to Revoke in Forma Pauperis Status. Filing fee due: 10 days. Fn1 [In light of this order, appellant's "request[s] for information" from the courts' clerks are denied as moot.] 06-21407
11/02/2006Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Nevada Department of Corrections (Raymond Gillen)-check no. 167025.
11/02/2006Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Notice of Compliance to Court Order. 06-22442
11/02/2006Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to appellant Raymond Gillen stating that check no. 166898 in the amount of $250.00 for the cost bond was forwarded to the Carson City Clerk.
11/03/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due in District Court Case No. 05-00521A: 120 days. 06-22549
12/27/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Directing Response. Respondents' response, including points and authorities, addressing the issues raised in this appeal and the arguments made in appellant's civil proper person appeal statement due: 30 days. No extensions of time will be granted absent exteme and unforeseeable circumstances. 06-26530
01/29/2007BriefFiled Response to Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. 07-02150
01/29/2007AppendixFiled Appendix. Respondents' Appendix in Support of Response to Appellant's Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. 07-02151
02/28/2007Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 and 2. 07-04803
02/28/2007Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
05/11/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "We AFFIRM the district court's summary judgment." SNP07-MG/MD/MC. 07-10489
06/05/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 07-11810
06/05/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/20/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 6, 2007. 07-11810