judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SAPPHIRE COMMUNICATIONS OF V. PUBLIC SERVICE COMMISSISON

Case Information: 89-AA-0179
Short Caption:SAPPHIRE COMMUNICATIONS OF V. PUBLIC SERVICE COMMISSISONClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Public Service Commission
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:02/27/1989

Opening Event Date:02/27/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/09/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
Intervenor-RespondentJohn Doe N
Lee A. Satterfield NN
PetitionerSapphire Communications ofN
Thomas K. Crowe NN
RespondentPublic Service CommissionN
Charles L. Reischel NN
RespondentJohn Doe N
Howard C. Davenport NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901SAPPHIRE COMMUNICATIONS OF WASHINGTON, D.C., INC. PUBLIC SERVICE COMMISSISON OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
01/01/1906 SATTERFIELDL FOR: C&P TELEPHONE COMPANY
02/27/1989PETITION OF APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/27/1989$50.00 DOCKETING FEE GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/28/1989CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD & CHARLES L. REISCHEL GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/03/1989$5 PAID TO DC TREASURER PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/09/1989PETITIONER'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GT PANEL SCDATE 030989 SCHPRD DSA
03/16/1989RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/16/1989RESP MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE THE RECORD TO 30 DAYS AFTER COURT HAS RULED ON APPELLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS AD PANEL SCDATE 032089 SCHPRD R
03/28/1989PETITIONER'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE RECORD MLR PANEL SCDATE 032889 SCHPRD OPA
03/29/1989NOTICE OF INTENT TO INTERVENE OF C&P TELEPHONE COMPANY ON BEHALF OF RESPONDENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/19/1989FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
07/19/1989ORDER GRANTG MO TO DISMISS THIS CASE -THIS WILL NOT AFFECT NEW PET FOR REV FILED IN 89-290. PANELMKSC SCDATE 052289 SCHPRD CHECK
07/19/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -PC CITE
08/09/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/05/1990MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OD APLT MO REQUESTING REQUEST OF RELEASE PENDING APPEAL AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD