judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WILDER (JAMES) VS. STATE

Case Information: 42026
Short Caption:WILDER (JAMES) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 34178 , 44183
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C148939Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/09/2004How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/11/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/11/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 03-15250
10/22/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 120 days. See NRAP 11(a)(2) (each complete record shall contain each and every paper, pleading and other document filed, or submitted for filing, in the district court, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings.) fn1[The record shall not include any physical, non-documentary exhibits or the original documentary exhibits filed in the district court, but copies of documentary exhibits submitted in the district court proceedings shall be transmitted as part of the record on appeal. The record shall also include any presentence investigation reports submitted in this matter. The clerk of the district court shall transmit the reports to this court in a sealed envelope identifying the contents and marked confidential.] Nos. 41974/42021/42026/42029/42071 - cases are not consolidated. 03-17557
02/09/2004Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 through 4. 04-02477
02/09/2004Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
04/30/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Directing Transmission of Transcripts. On February 9, 2004, the record on appeal in district court case number C148939 was filed in this court. The record on appeal does not contain the transcripts for the hearings conducted on July 2, 2003, July 30, 2003 and August 5, 2003. These documents are essential for this court's review of the appeal. If the transcripts of the aforementioned hearings have already been prepared, the clerk of the district court shall have 10 days from the date of this order within which to transmit to the clerk of this court certified copies of the transcripts as a supplemental record on appeal. If the transcripts have not already been prepared, the district court shall order the prompt preparation of the aforementioned transcripts. The clerk of the district court shall have 10 days from the date the completed transcripts are filed in the district court within which to transmit to the clerk of this court a certified copy of the transcripts as a supplemental record on appeal. 04-07943
06/14/2004TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: August 5, 2004. Court Reporter: Diann Prock. 04-10937
06/29/2004TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 7/30/03 and 8/5/03. Court Reporters: Peggy Isom and Diann Prock. (Received from Clark Co. Clerk.) 04-11849
06/29/2004Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from Clark Co. Clerk. They were unable to obtain a copy of the July 2, 2003, hearing. 04-11852
07/23/2004TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: July 2, 2003. Court Reporter: Carrie Hansen. 04-13471
09/01/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order. of Limited Remand for Entry of Additional Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law. Within 30 days from the date of this order, we direct the district court to enter new and additional findings of fact and conclusions of law. If the district court determined that there was good cause to excuse the delay, the district court shall enter an order containing specific findings of facts and conclusions of law addressing good cause and the merits of the claims. fn6[It appears from the record that the district court had determined that there was good cause to excuse the delay. However, if this conclusion is incorrect, the district court shall enter new findings of facts and conclusions of law setting forth its analysis of appellant's claim of good cause.] Upon entry, the clerk of the district court shall immediately transmit a copy of the new findings of fact and conclusions of law to the clerk of this court. 04-15893
10/18/2004Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order filed in district court on October 13, 2004. 04-19269
11/15/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn9[We have reviewed all documents that appellant has submitted in proper person to the clerk of this court in this matter, and we conclude that no relief based upon those submissions is warranted. To the extent that appellant has attempted to present claims or facts in those submissions which were not previously presented in the proceedings below, we have declined to consider them in the first instance.] NNP04-NB/DA/MG 04-20906
11/23/2004Other Other. 11/23/04 ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING APPEAL NO. 44183. We direct the clerk of this court to administratively close the instant appeal and transfer to Docket No. 42026 all documents filed or received in this matter. Transferred from Docket No. 44183 to Docket No. 42026: 11/01/04: Filing Fee Waived: Criminal. 11/01/04: Filed Certified Copy of proper person Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (04-20111).
12/10/2004RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 04-21194
12/10/2004Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/20/2004RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 13, 2004. 04-21194