judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SAWYER VS. HULTGREN

Case Information: 42016
Short Caption:SAWYER VS. HULTGRENCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A430575Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/18/2003 / Shirinian, AraSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/10/2003Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $100.00 from Law Office of Donna Lee Schubert--check no. 2350. (Additional $150 due.)
09/10/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 03-15178
09/10/2003Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. (Additional $150 due.) Due Date: 10 days
09/17/2003Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. Additional $150.00 from Donna Lee Schubert - check no. 2352.
09/18/2003Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Ara H. Shirinian. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/22/2003MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 03-17596
10/23/2003Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed October 22, 2003. Appellant shall have until November 7, 2003, to file and serve the docketing statement. 03-17648
12/12/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order. to file Docketing Statement. To date, appellant has failed to file the docketing statement. Appellant shall, within 10 days from the date of this order, file and serve the docketing statement. Failure to comply timely may result in the imposition of sanctions, including dismissal of this appeal as abandoned. NRAP 14(c). 03-20747
12/19/2003Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 03-21142
12/22/2003MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Appellee's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to NRAP 4. 03-21211
12/22/2003Notice/Outgoing Letter. Ara H. Shirinian. (docketing statement)
01/26/2004Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 04-01583
01/26/2004Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 04-01584
02/04/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). fn1[Respondent's December 22, 2003, motion to dismiss is denied as moot.] NNP/CLK 04-02182
02/04/2004Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.