judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WALL VS. SHAW

Case Information: 42001
Short Caption:WALL VS. SHAWCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 47933
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A447899Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/18/2003 / Shirinian, AraSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/08/2003Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Law Office of Charles Lybarger--check no. 3096.
09/08/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 03-14994
09/17/2003Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Withdrawal of Appeal. (Appellant Scott Wall and The Wall Family Trust) 03-15540
09/18/2003Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Ara H. Shirinian. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/23/2003Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 03-17699
10/29/2003Order/DispositionalFiled Voluntary Dismissal. The settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties have agreed to a settlement of this appeal. On September 17, 2003, appellants filed a notice of withdrawal of appeal. Appellants' notice is treated as a motion for voluntary dismissal. Cause appearing, the motion is granted. "This appeal is dismissed." NRAP 42(b). SNP/CLK 03-18037
10/29/2003Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.