judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LOWEN VS. LOWEN

Case Information: 42005
Short Caption:LOWEN VS. LOWENCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D297714Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/09/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/09/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 03-15086
09/19/2003Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. We threfore conclude that we lack jurisdiction to consider this appeal, " . . . we dismiss it." SNP04-RR/ML/WM 03-15728
10/14/2003RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 03-15909
10/14/2003Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/27/2003RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 16, 2003. 03-15909