judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FIZER VS. TURNBERRY TOWERS

Case Information: 45932
Short Caption:FIZER VS. TURNBERRY TOWERSCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A502307Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/07/2005 / Haberfeld, StephenSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:08/18/2006How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/15/2005Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Christensen Law Offices, LLC--check no. 11027.
09/15/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 05-18384
10/07/2005Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Stephen E. Haberfeld . (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/07/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement.
10/18/2005Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 05-20640
10/27/2005Docketing StatementFiled Response to Docketing Statement. Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. 05-21306
11/02/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. of Response to Docketing Statement on Settlement Judge. 05-21649
12/27/2005Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. This appeal should be removed from the program. 05-25154
12/29/2005Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. 05-25379
01/23/2006Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Request Transcripts.
02/02/2006Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 07/19/05. To Court Reporter: Shelly Ajoub. 06-02430
04/10/2006MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 06-07505
04/17/2006Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the opening brief and appendix received on April 6, 2006. Answering brief due: 30 days. 06-07968
04/17/2006BriefFiled Opening Brief. 06-07285
04/17/2006AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 06-07286
05/22/2006BriefFiled Answering Brief. 06-10742
05/22/2006AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 06-10743
06/30/2006Case Status Update Briefing Completed. No reply brief filed.
08/18/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. fn1[We have determined that this appeal should be submitted for a decision on the briefs without oral argument.] "We affirm the district court's order." fn8[The issue of attorney fees is not properly before this court, and the award of costs is affirmed. We decline to impose sanctions as requested by respondents in their answering brief.] SNP06-WM/MG/JH 06-17296
08/18/2006Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
09/12/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-17506
09/12/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/19/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 14, 2006. 06-17506