judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SUAREZ VS. MAGNO

Case Information: 43962
Short Caption:SUAREZ VS. MAGNOCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D233884Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Child Custody
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/24/2004 / Worrell, CarolynSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/17/2004Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Huntsman & Hempen--check no. 2593.
09/17/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 04-17252
09/24/2004Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
11/12/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order. to date, appellant has failed to file the docketing statement. Appellant shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file and serve the docketing statement. 04-20777
11/17/2004Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 04-21116
12/16/2004Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: January 18, 2005. 04-22977
03/08/2005Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 05-04599
04/07/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties have agreed to a settlement. Appellant shall have 30 days to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. Failure to comply with this order in a timely manner may result in the dismissal of this appeal as abandoned. 05-06859
07/18/2005MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion Requesting Additional Time to Submit Settlement Agreement. 05-14266
12/20/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We deny the motion to submit settlement agreement. Appellant shall file a stipulation or motion to dismiss or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal within 15 days. Failure to comply with this order in a timely manner may result in the dismissal of this appeal as abandoned. 05-24733
01/12/2006MotionFiled Stipulation. Stipulation for Custody and Visitation. 06-00857
01/26/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Order of Remand and Dismissing Appeal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . we dismiss this appeal." NRAP 42(b). This matter is remanded to the district court to conduct appropriate proceedings. In the event the district court declines to grant the requested relief, appellant may file a motion to reinstate this appeal. NNP-MD/NB/RP 06-01889
01/26/2006Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.