judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LANGON VS. DIST. CT. (MATAMOROS)

Case Information: 42056
Short Caption:LANGON VS. DIST. CT. (MATAMOROS)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 42153
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0201697Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/18/2003Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from E. Sue Saunders-check no. 1471.
09/18/2003Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus. 03-15609
09/19/2003Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Procedural Deficiency. Affidavit. Due Date: 10 days
09/19/2003Petition/WritFiled Affidavit in Support of Petition for Writ. 03-15754
09/23/2003Petition/WritFiled Affidavit in Support of Petition for Writ. Affidavit of Verification. 03-15934
09/23/2003Petition/WritFiled Affidavit in Support of Petition for Writ. Affidavit of John Langon. 03-15935
09/25/2003Other Returned Mail. Receipt for Documents dated 09/18/03 addressed to Frank Roberts remailed to corrected address.
09/26/2003Other Returned Mail. Notice issued 09/19/03 addressed to Frank Roberts remailed to corrected address.
10/03/2003Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. for Writ of Mandamus. "We deny the petition." NNP04S-NB/MS/MG 03-16457
10/28/2003RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 03-16568
10/28/2003Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.