judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STATE VS. DISTRICT COURT (CONN)

Case Information: 42058
Short Caption:STATE VS. DISTRICT COURT (CONN)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C194231Classification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Certiorari/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/18/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/18/2003Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. Petition for Writ of Prohibition or in the Alternative, Mandamus. 03-15658
09/18/2003AppendixFiled Appendix. Petitioner's Appendix. 03-15659
10/23/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. The real party in interest, on behalf of respondents, shall have 20 days from the date of this order within which to file an answer, including authorities, against issuance of the requested writ. 03-17665
11/04/2003Petition/WritFiled Supplement to Petition for Writ. 03-18378
11/14/2003MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief (Answer to Writ Petition) First Request. 03-19013
11/20/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed November 14, 2003. The real party in interest shall have until December 8, 2003, to file his answer. No further extensions of time shall be permitted absent demonstration of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. Counsel's caseload will not be deemed such a circumstance. 03-19333
01/23/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Counsel for the real party in interest shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file the answer or show cause why this court should not impose sanctions against counsel. 04-01460
02/23/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Not Filing an Answering Brief. 04-03365
04/09/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Status Report. The State shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve a report advising this court whether the issues presented in the instant petition have been or are likely to be rendered moot by plea negotiations in the proceedings below. 04-06615
04/16/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Status Report. re: Mootness 04-07054
04/20/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Addendum to Status Report re: Mootness. 04-07328
03/08/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. The State shall have 15 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this petition should not be dismissed as moot. Failure to timely respond to this order may result in the immediate dismissal of this petition. 05-04521
03/22/2005MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 05-05618
04/21/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. as Moot. "We deny the petition as moot." NNP05-WM/MD/RP 05-07849
05/17/2005RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 05-07906
05/17/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.