judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WALLERS (KURT) VS. STATE

Case Information: 45947
Short Caption:WALLERS (KURT) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 29532 , 61238
Lower Court Case(s):Lyon Co. - Third Judicial District - CR4133Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/29/2005How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/16/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/16/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 05-18491
09/19/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. District court minutes. Due Date: 10 days
09/30/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 60 days. 05-19517
11/29/2005Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 and 2. 05-23332
11/29/2005Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
12/21/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn14[We have reviewed all proper person documents, and we conclude that no relief is warranted.] SNP06-WM/MG/JH 05-24864
01/17/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-00510
01/17/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/25/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 18, 2006. 06-00510