judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DOUGLAS HOWARD CRAFT v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-12-0030)
Case Number:S-12-0030Case Docketed On:02/23/2012
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Morals, Decency and Family 6-4-101 - 6-4-502
Short Title:DOUGLAS HOWARD CRAFT v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:DOUGLAS HOWARD CRAFT, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDouglas Howard CraftDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Kirk Allan Morgan
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
David L. Delicath
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Prosecutorial Misconduct, Criminal Law -Sufficiency of Evidence
Opinion Number:2012 WY 166
Citation:291 P.3d 306

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/23/2012Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/23/2012Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/23/2012Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/01/2012Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
04/10/2012Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
04/10/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/29/2012Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
05/30/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee; and copy of Designation of Record on Appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/19/2012Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/25/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Confidential Folder; Volume IV, Transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/25/2012Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
07/13/2012Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
07/17/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Kirk A. Morgan obo AppellantNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/13/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from D. Michael Pauling obo AppelleeNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/21/2012Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice. Argued before Chief Justice Kite, Justices Golden, Hill, Voigt and Burke (Kirk Allan Morgan for Appellant and D. Michael Pauling for Appellee) and taken under advisement.Notice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
12/28/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
01/15/2013Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
01/15/2013Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
01/15/2013Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
01/15/2013Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/18/2013Service - Certified mail signature return card - record signed for 1/17/2013ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal