Case: WR-44,122-01
WR-44,122-01
12/30/1999
1107-HC
SPLUDE, WILLIAM
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
08/30/2000 | ACTION TAKEN | File and set | |
08/30/2000 | ACTION TAKEN | File and set | |
07/31/2000 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submitted of a process | | |
07/10/2000 | MISC DOCU RECD | | |
05/30/2000 | SUPP RECD | | |
05/30/2000 | SUPP RECD | | |
03/01/2000 | MISC DOCU RECD | | |
02/16/2000 | ORDER ISSUED | HC remanded TC - evidentiary hearing or affidavits | |
02/16/2000 | ORDER ISSUED | HC remanded TC - evidentiary hearing or affidavits | |
01/27/2000 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submitted of a process | | |
12/30/1999 | HC WRIT RECEIVED | | |
12/30/1999 | WRIT RECEIVED | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
08/30/2000 | FILED | FILE & SET |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Splude, William | Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases) |
Court of Appeals Information:
2nd Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court 3
Tarrant
C-3-4601-0451165-