Case: 01-04-00216-CV
01-04-00216-CV
03/08/2004
Miscellaneous/other civil
Massanutten Military Academy
Marcy Anderson, Ind., and a/n/f of G.A., minor child
No
Thomson/West
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
12/03/2004 | Mandate issued - criminal or civil | | |||
10/14/2004 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismissed |
| ||
10/14/2004 | Motion to dismiss appeal disposed | Grant motion | | ||
10/13/2004 | Submitted | | |||
10/12/2004 | Case ready to be set | | |||
09/22/2004 | Motion filing fee paid. | | |||
09/22/2004 | Motion to dismiss appeal | | |||
09/08/2004 | Correspondence | | |||
09/03/2004 | Correspondence | Strike document filed in this Court | | ||
08/26/2004 | Brief past due letter sent for CV APE Brf's ONLY. | | |||
06/15/2004 | Brief Due | | |||
06/15/2004 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion in part and deny motion in part | | ||
05/26/2004 | Brief Due | | |||
05/21/2004 | Motion to extend time to file brief - fee received | | |||
05/06/2004 | Brief filed-oral argument has been requested | | |||
05/05/2004 | Docketing statement filed | | |||
04/29/2004 | Inserted for Envelope generation. | | |||
04/29/2004 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | | ||
04/25/2004 | Brief Due | | |||
04/23/2004 | Motion filing fee paid. | | |||
04/15/2004 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |||
04/15/2004 | Record has been checked in | | |||
04/11/2004 | Record due | | |||
04/08/2004 | Record has been checked out. | | |||
04/06/2004 | Record has been checked out. | | |||
03/26/2004 | Reporter's record filed (statement of facts) | | |||
03/25/2004 | Docketing statement filed | | |||
03/23/2004 | Clerk's record filed (transcript) | | |||
03/08/2004 | NOA received in COA from trial court. | | |||
03/01/2004 | Request for findings of fact and conclusions of law filed in trial court (Tex. R. Civ. P. 296) | | |||
03/01/2004 | Notice of appeal filed | | |||
02/11/2004 | Date judgment signed by trial judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
12/03/2004 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Anderson, Marcy | Appellee | Preston C. Goodwin |
Massanutten Military Academy | Appellant | John A. Buckley Jr. Steven Carl Windsor Tara B. Annweiler |
Trial Court Information
56th District Court
Galveston
Honorable Hon. Norma Venso
03CV0967