judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-4821
A-4821
07/19/1954
Application for Writ of Error
FRANCO RICHARDS
C. H. RICHARDS, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/14/1954Motion for RehearingPetitioner
08/13/1954Response to Brief filedRespondent
08/05/1954Reply to ResponsePetitioner
07/27/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
07/19/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/05/1955Letter Filed
12/14/1954Motion for RehearingOverruled
08/13/1954Response to Brief filed
08/05/1954Reply to Response
07/27/1954Response to Petition
07/19/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledRefused
07/19/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Franco RichardsPetitioner
C. H. Richards, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information