judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-4921
A-4921
10/18/1954
Application for Writ of Error
D. E. WHELAN AND R. J. WHELAN
STATE OF TEXAS, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/23/1955Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
07/28/1955Motion for RehearingRespondent
03/04/1955Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filedPetitioner
02/28/1955Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
02/23/1955Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
02/18/1955Response to Brief filedPetitioner
01/24/1955Response to Reply filedRespondent
01/14/1955Reply to ResponsePetitioner
01/11/1955Response to PetitionRespondent
01/03/1955Response to Reply filedPetitioner
12/27/1954Reply to ResponseAmicus Curiae
12/22/1954Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filedPetitioner
11/30/1954Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
10/18/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/31/1957Letter Filed
11/21/1955Miscellaneous MotionFiling granted
09/23/1955Amicus Curiae Brief received
07/30/1955Response to Motion filed
07/28/1955Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/13/1955Opinion issued
03/04/1955Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed
02/28/1955Supplemental Brief filed
02/23/1955Amicus Curiae Brief received
02/18/1955Response to Brief filed
01/26/1955Document received (See Remarks)
01/26/1955Document received (See Remarks)
01/26/1955Document received (See Remarks)
01/26/1955Document received (See Remarks)
01/26/1955Document received (See Remarks)
01/24/1955Response to Reply filed
01/14/1955Reply to Response
01/11/1955Response to Petition
01/03/1955Response to Reply filed
12/27/1954Reply to Response
12/22/1954Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed
11/30/1954Amicus Curiae Brief received
10/18/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
10/18/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas Bankers AssociationAmicus Curiae
State of Texas, et al.Respondent
John Ben Shepperd, Attorney GeneralAmicus Curiae
D. E. Whelan and R. J. WhelanPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information