Case: 13-98-00154-CR
13-98-00154-CR
03/31/1998
Sexual Assault
Robles, Juan Pablo Hernandez
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
01/18/2000 | Mandate Recd Ct Crim App / Dt. Clk | | |
12/21/1999 | Mandate Issued | | |
10/07/1999 | Opinion issued | Otherwise Disposed | |
08/30/1999 | Submitted | | |
08/30/1999 | Submission | | |
08/26/1999 | Submission | | |
12/17/1998 | Motion for leave to file brief DISPOSED | Motion or Writ Granted | |
12/01/1998 | Brief Filed | | |
12/01/1998 | No oral argument requested | | |
12/01/1998 | Motion for leave to file brief | | |
11/12/1998 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
11/05/1998 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
10/01/1998 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
09/21/1998 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
08/21/1998 | Case ready to be set | | |
08/21/1998 | No oral argument requested | | |
08/21/1998 | Brief Filed | | |
08/06/1998 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
07/24/1998 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
06/24/1998 | Court Reporter Pages | | |
06/24/1998 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |
04/17/1998 | ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come | | |
04/15/1998 | docketing statement received | | |
04/07/1998 | Affidavit Filed | | |
03/31/1998 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |
03/31/1998 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
03/31/1998 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
12/21/1999 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Robles, Juan Pablo Hernandez | Appellant | Hon. Reynaldo M. Merino |
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Hon. Theodore C. Hake Hon. Rene A. Guerra Cheryl Hole |
Trial Court Information
92nd District Court
Hidalgo
Honorable Benjamin A Martinez
CR-2234-07-A
25 yrs TDC