judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 07-96-00387-CR
07-96-00387-CR
11/06/1996
Other Felony
Hulsey, Vincent Reno
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/20/1999Case Returned from Higher Court
01/11/1999Case Forwarded to Higher Court
12/11/1998Petition for Discretionary Review Filed
02/19/1998Mandate Issued
10/30/1997Extension filed with CCA
10/03/1997Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/03/1997Submitted
10/03/1997Submission
05/23/1997Brief Filed
05/23/1997Case ready to be set
05/22/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief filedGRANT
04/23/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
04/21/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
03/24/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
03/21/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
02/24/1997Brief Filed
02/10/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
02/07/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
01/09/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
01/08/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
12/09/1996Do not use
12/06/1996Do not use
11/06/1996Notice of Appeal Filed
11/06/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/19/1998Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Hulsey, VIncent RenoCriminal - AppellantWilliam E. Kelly III
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasKatherine L. Levy
Trial Court Information
251st District Court
Potter
Honorable Patrick A. Pirtle
33607-C
25 Yrs TDCJ-ID