judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 12th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 12-81-00114-CR
12-81-00114-CR
10/21/1981
Assault & battery
Duplechin, John Earl
Texas, The State of
No
14th Court of Appeals
09/01/1981
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/08/1985
02/21/1985Mandate Issued
01/30/1985Higher Court DecisionAffirmed
05/02/1984Opinion issuedMotion or Writ Granted
05/02/1984Opinion issuedRefused
12/22/1983
11/10/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/25/1983Record returned.
06/29/1983Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
04/29/1983
03/17/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/17/1983Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Overruled
02/14/1983Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
02/14/1983Supplemental Brief Received
11/15/1982Supplemental Brief Filed
10/22/1982Submitted
06/24/1982Submission
05/19/1982Letter from the Court
03/04/1982Supplemental Brief Filed
10/21/1981Exhibit(s) filed
10/21/1981No Description Available.
10/21/1981Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
06/02/1980Brief Filed
05/16/1980Brief Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/08/1985Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
178th District Court
Harris
298.293
Life