judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-81-00808-CR
14-81-00808-CR
10/16/1981
Arson
Savell, Johnny Lee
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/27/1984No description available.
05/26/1983Mandate Issued
05/26/1983Opinion issuedABATED
10/07/1982Order Entered
09/30/1982No description available.
07/15/1982Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
06/23/1982No description available.
03/25/1982Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
03/01/1982Record Filed (Both records FILED)
10/16/1981Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/26/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
228th District Court
Harris
Honorable TED POE
332,687
25 yrs.