judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-81-00348-CV
04-81-00348-CV
10/16/1981
Miscellaneous civil
Lowery, Albert A., and Lowery, Lasses Lorene
Saunders, Nancy Adele and Saunders, Bill
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/14/2014Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
10/30/1984Original Exhibits Returned
10/30/1984Mandate Issued
10/30/1984Case Returned from Higher Court
10/30/1984Mandate Issued
10/10/1984Order EnteredMotion or Writ Denied
07/18/1984Higher Court DecisionRefused
03/09/1984Case Forwarded to Higher Court
03/07/1984Writ of Error filed
02/06/1984Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
01/26/1984Motion for Rehearing Filed
01/11/1984Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/11/1984Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/08/1983Submission
02/08/1983Submission
02/08/1983Submitted
02/01/1983Brief Filed
12/23/1982Submission Letter Sent
03/30/1982Mot. EOT t/file Supp. Transcript DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/25/1982Mot. EOT t/file Supp. Transcript Filed
02/25/1982No Description Available.
02/25/1982Requests Oral Argument
02/22/1982Requests Oral Argument
12/18/1981Brief Filed
12/18/1981Case ready to be set
12/04/1981Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/04/1981Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
11/16/1981Brief Filed
10/16/1981Record Filed
10/16/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
10/02/1981Appeal Bond Filed
07/09/1981Judgment Signed in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/14/2014Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 4
Bexar
Honorable Peter Michael Curry
152,914