judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-81-00338-CR
04-81-00338-CR
10/15/1981
Burglary
Thompson, Larry D.
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/14/2014Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
08/19/1983Mandate Issued
08/19/1983Mandate Issued
06/29/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed and Reformed
06/29/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed and Reformed
12/07/1982Submission
12/07/1982Submission
12/07/1982Submitted
02/19/1982Case ready to be set
02/19/1982Brief Filed
02/19/1982Case ready to be set
02/10/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/03/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
12/30/1981Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/23/1981Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/21/1981Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
12/15/1981Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
12/11/1981Brief Recd (If in excess of page limit and/or late)
12/11/1981Brief Filed
11/25/1981Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
11/05/1981Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion Granted in Part
11/02/1981Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
10/15/1981Record Filed
10/15/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
10/09/1981Record Approved
05/29/1981Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/14/2014Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
175th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Peter Michael Curry
80-CR-1041
3 Years