judyrecords
594 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-81-00355-CV
04-81-00355-CV
10/20/1981
Miscellaneous civil
Jimenez, Richard
Maloney, pat and Alter, Sylvan R.
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/01/1983Mandate Issued
08/01/1983Mandate Issued
07/27/1983Case Returned from Higher Court
07/06/1983Higher Court DecisionDismissed-Want of Jurisdiction
05/16/1983Case Forwarded to Higher Court
05/09/1983Writ of Error filed
04/14/1983Motion EOT to file Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
03/16/1983Motion EOT to file Motion for Rehearing Filed
02/23/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/23/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/09/1983Submission
02/09/1983Submission
02/09/1983Submitted
12/23/1982Case ready to be set
12/23/1982Case ready to be set
12/22/1982Brief Filed
03/08/1982Requests Oral Argument
11/24/1981Brief Filed
11/24/1981Brief Filed
10/30/1981Brief Filed
10/20/1981No Description Available.
10/20/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
10/05/1981Appeal Bond Filed
09/24/1981Judgment Signed in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/01/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
131st Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable David Peeples
81-CI-4463