judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 13-81-00214-CR
13-81-00214-CR
10/15/1981
Aggravated Robbery
Juan Lopez
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
07/21/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/04/2016Case stored
02/26/2016Record checked in
07/21/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requested
07/02/1982Motion for rehearing filed
06/17/1982Opinion issued
02/05/1982Submitted
10/15/1981Clerks record attachments filed
10/15/1981Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
10/15/1981Exhibits filed
10/15/1981Reporters record filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/04/2016Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
117th District Court
Nueces
78-CR-429-B