judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-89-00128-CV
02-89-00128-CV
06/09/1989
Workers Compensation
Sanchez, Raul
New York Underwriters Insurance Co. and David Sampson
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/31/1990Mandate Issued
12/05/1990Writ DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/28/1990Writ Filed
05/31/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
05/10/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
04/25/1990Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
01/23/1990Motion to Substitute AttorneyMotion or Writ Granted
01/19/1990Motion to Substitute Attorney
12/27/1989Letter Brief Filed
12/20/1989Letter Brief Filed
12/13/1989Submitted
12/13/1989Submission
12/08/1989Supplemental Brief Filed
11/22/1989Brief Filed
09/26/1989Motion to Substitute AttorneyMotion or Writ Granted
09/25/1989Motion to Substitute Attorney
09/22/1989Brief Filed
09/13/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/12/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
08/15/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/11/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
07/05/1989No Description Available.
07/05/1989Submission
06/09/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
06/09/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/02/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
New York Underwriters Ins.co.AppelleeAnne Gardner
Sanchez, RaulAppellant
Sampson, DavidAppelleeAnne Gardner
Trial Court Information
348th District Court
Tarrant
Honorable John E Bradshaw
348-94269-86