judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-9493
A-9493
03/08/1963
Application for Writ of Error
WHITENER TRANSFER AND STORAGE, INC.
GENERAL MOVING AND STORAGE, INC. ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/09/1963Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
03/25/1963Response to Brief filedRespondent
03/08/1963Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/09/1963Supplemental Brief filed
03/25/1963Response to Brief filed
03/12/1963Statement of Jurisidiction
03/11/1963Motion to dismiss
03/08/1963Application for Writ of Error - Filed
03/08/1963Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Whitener Transfer and Storage, Inc.Petitioner
General Moving and Storage, Inc. et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information