judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-81-00433-CR
14-81-00433-CR
09/30/1981
Burglary
Herrera, Juan R.
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/11/1985Mandate Issued
12/19/1984No description available.
12/13/1984Substitute OpinionAFFIRMED
12/07/1984Case reinstated
02/23/1982Mandate Issued
12/23/1981Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
11/27/1981Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STADENIED
11/17/1981AM CUR, OTHER,
09/30/1981Record Filed (Both records FILED)
04/02/1981Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/11/1985Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes, Jr.
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantRuben Guerrero
Trial Court Information
178th District Court
Harris
327,470
Life