judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 10-81-00140-CR
10-81-00140-CR
10/01/1981
Murder
Dennis Earl Scott
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
10/01/1981Brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
10/01/1981Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/10/1982Case stored
03/10/1982Mandate issued by this Court
12/31/1981Judgment Issued
12/31/1981Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/03/1981Submitted
10/01/1981Record filed
10/01/1981Brief filed - oral argument not requested
10/01/1981Brief filed - oral argument not requested
10/01/1981Docketing statement filed
10/01/1981Notice of Appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/10/2082Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
10th District Court
Galveston
35,919
25 Years