judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 10-81-00129-CR
10-81-00129-CR
10/01/1981
Assault
Roger Byron Fleming
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/07/2008Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
02/02/1983Case stored
02/02/1983Mandate issued by this Court
11/30/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/22/1982Submitted
10/01/1981Notice of Appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/07/2008Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Co Crim Ct at Law No 10
Harris
581760
6 Months + $350 Fine