judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 10-81-00143-CR
10-81-00143-CR
10/01/1981
Aggravated Robbery
Robert Lee Bolton
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/10/1983Case stored
03/10/1983Mandate issued by this Court
12/31/1981Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/10/1981Submitted
10/01/1981Notice of Appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/10/2083Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
208th District Court
Harris
228965
Life