judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-96-00512-CR
02-96-00512-CR
11/07/1996
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
McLaughlin, Lester Austin
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/30/1999Order Entered
03/23/1999Mandate Issued
02/24/1999Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCARefused
09/24/1998Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCA
08/20/1998Mo for Ext to File Petition for Discretionary ReviewMotion or Writ Granted
07/23/1998Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
07/02/1998Motion for Rehearing Filed
06/16/1998Motion for Extension for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/05/1998Motion for Extension for Rehearing Filed
06/01/1998Motion for Extension for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/15/1998Motion for Extension for Rehearing Filed
04/30/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/21/1997Letter
10/14/1997Submitted
10/14/1997Submission
10/13/1997Other Document Received
09/24/1997Letter
09/22/1997Letter
06/09/1997Brief Filed
06/09/1997Case ready to be set
04/18/1997Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/17/1997Submission
04/16/1997Brief Filed
04/11/1997Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
04/01/1997Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/27/1997Response Filed
02/28/1997Motion Filed
02/20/1997Brief Filed
12/12/1996Exhibits Filed
12/12/1996No Description Available.
11/25/1996No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
11/19/1996No Description Available.
11/07/1996No Description Available.
11/07/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/23/1999Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mclaughlin, Lester AustinCriminal - AppellantMichael B. Curtis
Unknown UserCriminal - State of TexasJohn Brasher
Trial Court Information
78th District Court
Wichita
Honorable Keith Nelson, Judge, 78th District Court
31,739-B
12 yrs IDTDCJ