judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-96-01367-CR
01-96-01367-CR
11/13/1996
Attempted Murder
Cooper, Everette Earl
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/05/2000Complete filed returned from atty general office
06/18/1999Case file forwarded to higher Court or agency
07/31/1998Mandate issued - criminal or civil
07/31/1998Mandate issued - criminal or civil
06/26/1998Motion for Rehearing Due
06/11/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/11/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/24/1998Submitted
03/24/1998Submission
03/24/1998Submitted
02/06/1998Submission
11/13/1997Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
11/13/1997Case ready to be set
11/13/1997Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
11/13/1997Case ready to be set
10/31/1997Brief received only-oral argument requested
10/31/1997Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
10/26/1997Brief Due
09/26/1997Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
09/05/1997Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
08/22/1997Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
07/24/1997Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
07/16/1997Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
07/14/1997Brief Due
06/26/1997Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
06/12/1997Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
05/12/1997Statement of facts filed
03/27/1997Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
03/14/1997Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
03/04/1997Statement of Facts Due
01/30/1997Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
01/14/1997Transcript filed
01/11/1997Record due
01/09/1997Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
11/13/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
11/12/1996Date of Sentence in Criminal Case
11/12/1996Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/31/1998Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes
Carmen C. Mitchell
Calvin A. Hartmann
COOPER, EVERETTE EARLCriminal - AppellantJane C. Disko
Trial Court Information
183rd District Court
Harris
Honorable JAY W. BURNETT
9426602
Life