judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 13-96-00560-CR
13-96-00560-CR
11/13/1996
Other Felony
Johnson, Raymond T.
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/13/1999Mandate Recd Ct Crim App / Dt. Clk
12/07/1999Mandate Issued
11/19/1999Record returned
10/20/1999Higher Court DecisionRefused
04/13/1999Court of Crim. Appeals Number
04/08/1999Petition for Discretionary Review sent to S.Ct.
03/10/1999Petition for Review
02/12/1999Motion for Extension of Time DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/12/1999XPetition for Discretionary Review
01/07/1999Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/31/1998Submitted
12/31/1998Submission
12/10/1998Entry of Judge Selection for Case.
12/10/1998Submission
01/07/1998Brief Filed
01/07/1998No oral argument requested
12/04/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/25/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/06/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
10/28/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
09/04/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
08/29/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
08/28/1997Motion for leave to file brief DISPOSEDMotion or Writ Granted
08/20/1997Motion for leave to file brief
08/11/1997Brief Filed
08/11/1997Case ready to be set
08/11/1997Brief received.
08/11/1997No oral argument requested
07/17/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
07/09/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
06/30/199710 day letter sent
05/15/1997Green card in
05/08/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
05/08/1997Order Entered
04/28/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
04/24/199710 day letter sent
03/06/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
02/24/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/19/1996Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/09/1996Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/18/1996Supplemental transcript filed
11/13/1996Transcript Filed
11/13/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
11/07/1996Statement of Facts Filed
11/07/1996Statement of Facts Number of Pages in Remarks
11/07/1996Statement of Facts Received
10/04/1996Statement of Facts Filed
10/04/1996Statement of Facts Number of Pages in Remarks
10/04/1996Statement of Facts Received
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/07/1999Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Johnson, Raymond T.AppellantSteven L. Crews
Debbie S. Holmes
Clifford Roberson
Candace Norris
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasHerbert B. Hancock
Trial Court Information
156th District Court
Bee
Honorable Joel Ballard Johnson
B-95-M030-0-PR-B
50 yrs TDC