judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-89-00485-CV
14-89-00485-CV
06/12/1989
Miscellaneous civil
In The Matter of I.C.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/07/2011Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
05/25/1990Case stored
05/14/1990Mandate Issued
05/14/1990Mandate Issued
04/13/1990No motion for rehearing FILED
03/29/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
03/29/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
03/21/1990Submitted
03/21/1990Submission
03/21/1990Submitted
02/26/1990Submission
11/03/1989Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
11/03/1989Case ready to be set
11/03/1989Case ready to be set
11/02/1989Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
10/12/1989Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
10/05/1989Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAMOOT
10/05/1989Mtn.dismiss DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,COURTS,JOINT,STADENIED
10/05/1989Mtn.to supplement transcript DISPOSED-ANT,APE,STAGRANTED
10/05/1989No description available.
09/22/1989Mtn.to supplement transcript FILED-ANT,APE,STA
09/18/1989Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
09/15/1989Mtn.Dismiss FILED-ANT,APE,APP,COURTS,JOINT,STA
08/23/1989Supplemental transcript RECEIVED - ANT,APE,STA
08/17/1989Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
08/10/1989Exhibits FILED
08/10/1989Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
06/29/1989Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
06/16/1989Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
06/12/1989Transcript FILED
06/12/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
04/20/1989Judgment signed by trial court judge
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/07/2011Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppelleeRichard A. Dawson
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellantSteve D. Monk
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 2
Fort Bend
Honorable WALTER S. MCMEANS
2123