judyrecords
594 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-81-00281-CR
02-81-00281-CR
09/28/1981
Burglary
Jackson, Billy Ray
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/05/1983Mandate Issued
03/09/1983Opinion issuedRefused
01/19/1983Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCA
12/15/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/01/1982Submitted
12/01/1982Submission
07/08/1982Submission
01/13/1982Brief Filed
12/14/1981Brief Filed
10/16/1981Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/28/1981Criminal record or relator's record and/or exhibits
09/28/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/05/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 1
Tarrant
Honorable Clyde R. Ashworth
24736-A
99 yrs.