judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-81-00295-CR
04-81-00295-CR
09/28/1981
Burglary
Marquez, Antonio
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/06/1983Mandate Executed By The Trial Court
07/06/1983Mandate Issued
07/06/1983Mandate Issued
06/30/1983Case Returned from Higher Court
06/08/1983Higher Court DecisionRefused
04/05/1983Case Forwarded to Higher Court
04/04/1983Petition for Review Filed
02/16/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/16/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/11/1983Supplemental Brief Filed
01/19/1983Submission
01/19/1983Submission
01/19/1983Submitted
09/28/1981Case ready to be set
09/28/1981Brief Filed
09/28/1981Brief Filed
09/28/1981Record Filed
09/28/1981Case ready to be set
09/28/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/14/2013Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
07/06/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
144th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable ROY R. BARRERA, SR.
80-CR-2968
Life