judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-89-00700-CR
05-89-00700-CR
06/12/1989
Other Felony
The State of Texas
Harvey Othel Martin
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/16/1992Mandate IssuedReversed & Remanded to Tr. Ct.
06/19/1992Opinion issuedReversed & Remanded to Tr. Ct.
11/21/1990Petition for Discretionary Review FiledMotion or Writ Granted
10/22/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
09/26/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
09/11/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/11/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/05/1990Submission
06/05/1990Submitted
06/05/1990Submission
06/05/1990Submitted
04/25/1990Submission
04/19/1990MattConv
04/09/1990Motion to Postpone DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/06/1990Motion for Postponement
02/12/1990MattConv
12/13/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/08/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/08/1989Brief Filed
12/08/1989Case ready to be set
12/08/1989Letter Sent by the Court
12/08/1989Case ready to be set
11/21/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/20/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
10/18/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
10/17/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
09/22/1989Brief Filed
08/15/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
08/14/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
07/24/1989Statement of Facts Filed
06/19/1989Transcript Filed
06/12/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/08/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
05/24/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/16/1992Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 3
Collin
3-883-88
Motion to Suppress Granted