judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 08-81-00145-CR
08-81-00145-CR
10/05/1981
Other Felony
Gooden, Ronald Douglas
Texas, The State of
No
5th Court of Appeals
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/04/1984Shuck purged
05/04/1982Mandate Issued
02/24/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/24/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/28/1982Submitted
01/28/1982Submission
01/28/1982Submitted
12/07/1981Submission
10/05/1981Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
10/05/1981Case ready to be set
10/05/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/04/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - AppellantHon. Walter L. Irvin
UnknownCriminal - State of TexasHon. Henry Wade
Trial Court Information
F79,5902-JR
2 yrs.