judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 10-81-00158-CR
10-81-00158-CR
10/15/1981
Burglary of a Habitation
Frankie Lee Davis
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/10/2008Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
10/05/1982Case stored
10/05/1982Mandate issued by this Court
05/27/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/13/1982Submitted
10/15/1981Notice of Appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/10/2008Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
54th District Court
McLennan
81-295-C
10 Years