judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 10-81-00154-CR
10-81-00154-CR
10/14/1981
Burglary of a Building
Gary Wayne Mathis
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/10/1982Case stored
08/10/1982Mandate issued by this Court
04/08/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/07/1982Submitted
10/14/1981Notice of Appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/10/2082Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
13th District Court
Navarro
21,043
Life