judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 09-81-00022-CV
09-81-00022-CV
10/13/1981
Miscellaneous civil
Adams, Royal D. & Susan Alsson-Kahn
Combs, Talmadge, et al
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/09/1984Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
08/13/1982Mandate Issued
06/10/1982Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
06/03/1982Motion for Rehearing Filed
05/20/1982Opinion issuedReversed & Rendered
03/04/1982Submitted
01/14/1982Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/04/1982Supplemental Brief Filed
12/28/1981Brief Filed
12/22/1981Submission
12/21/1981Brief Filed
11/09/1981Brief Filed
11/02/1981Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
10/13/1981Transcript Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/13/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
58th District Court
Jefferson
Honorable Jack A. Brookshire
A-112275