judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 10-81-00094-CR
10-81-00094-CR
10/01/1981
Aggravated Assault
Anthony Crawford
State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/16/2007Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
04/13/1982Case stored
04/13/1982Mandate issued by this Court
02/04/1982Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
01/28/1982Submitted
10/01/1981Notice of Appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/16/2007Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
177th District Court
Harris
291313
6 Years