judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 08-81-00106-CV
08-81-00106-CV
10/01/1981
Divorce
Abraham, Arthur
Abraham, A. Gail
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/04/1984Shuck purged
01/04/1984No description available.
12/19/1983Mandate Issued
12/08/1983Case Returned from Higher CourtNo description available.
08/25/1983Case Forwarded to Higher Court
08/19/1983Application for Writ of Error
08/19/1983No description available.
07/20/1983Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
07/18/1983Response to Petition, Motion or Inquiry
07/05/1983Motion for Rehearing Filed
06/22/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/22/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/10/1982No description available.Motion or Writ Denied
11/10/1982No description available.Motion or Writ Granted
10/15/1982Supplemental Brief Filed
10/08/1982Submitted
10/08/1982Submission
10/08/1982Submitted
10/01/1982No description available.
09/24/1982No description available.
09/13/1982Supplemental Brief Filed
08/18/1982Submission
01/29/1982Brief Filed
01/29/1982Case ready to be set
01/20/1982Motion for substitution of counsel disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/06/1982Motion for substitution of counsel filed
12/30/1981Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/23/1981Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
12/23/1981Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
12/23/1981Motion for substitution of counsel disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/22/1981Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
12/09/1981Motion for substitution of counsel filed
12/03/1981Motion for Dismissal Filed
12/03/1981No description available.
12/02/1981Brief Filed
11/04/1981Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/30/1981Response to Petition, Motion or Inquiry
10/28/1981Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
10/02/1981Statement of Facts Filed
10/01/1981Transcript Filed
10/01/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/19/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownAppellee
UnknownAppellant
UnknownAppellant
Trial Court Information
120th District Court
El Paso
80-2814