judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 08-81-00109-CV
08-81-00109-CV
10/05/1981
Divorce
Gary, Ralph Victor
Gary, Linda Jean
No
5th Court of Appeals
01/05/1981
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/15/2013Case sent to State Archives
06/04/1984Shuck purged
11/05/1982Mandate Issued
10/25/1982Case Returned from Higher Court
10/25/1982Decision from Supreme Court or CCARefused
06/02/1982No description available.
05/20/1982Application for Writ of Error
04/23/1982Brief Filed
04/21/1982Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
04/20/1982Response to Petition, Motion or Inquiry
04/08/1982Motion for Rehearing Filed
03/24/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed/Reversed & Rendered
03/24/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed/Reversed & Rendered
02/03/1982Supplemental Brief Filed
01/25/1982Submitted
01/18/1982Supplemental Brief Filed
12/07/1981Submission
10/05/1981Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
10/05/1981Case ready to be set
10/05/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
01/25/1981Submission
01/25/1981Submitted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/15/2013Case StoredCase archived
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownAppellee
UnknownAppellant
UnknownAppellee
UnknownAppellant
UnknownAppellee
Trial Court Information
255th District Court
Dallas
78-2684-S