judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 12th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 12-81-00072-CV
12-81-00072-CV
10/07/1981
Contract
Fears, Bill R., Ind. & Off. & Dir. Bill Fears Mobile Offices
Mechanical & Industrial Technicians, Inc.
No
14th Court of Appeals
05/07/1981
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/27/2002Case has been destroyed/Records Retention Action
06/26/1984Record returned.
06/26/1984Mandate Issued
05/09/1984Refused
09/05/1983Filing Fee Paid
09/05/1983
08/04/1983Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
07/18/1983motion for rehearing filed
07/07/1983Mot-Ext to File Rehear DispMotion or Writ Granted
06/24/1983
05/26/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/26/1983Motion to dismiss disposedOverruled
10/21/1982Submitted
06/24/1982Submission
10/15/1981No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
10/15/1981supplemental transcript filed
10/07/1981Brief Filed
10/07/1981No Description Available.
10/07/1981Brief Filed
10/07/1981supplemental transcript filed
10/07/1981Motion to dismiss disposedOtherwise Disposed
10/07/1981Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
10/07/1981No Description Available.
10/07/1981Motion to Dismiss Appeal Filed
05/01/1981Filing Fee Paid
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/27/2002Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
189th District Court
Harris
80-37841