judyrecords
594 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-96-00506-CR
02-96-00506-CR
11/06/1996
Other Felony
Beeman, Ex parte Derrick James
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/07/1997Mandate Issued
05/22/1997Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/21/1997Submitted
05/21/1997Submission
01/02/1997Brief Filed
01/02/1997Case ready to be set
12/20/1996Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/19/1996Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
11/27/1996Brief Filed
11/06/1996Criminal record or relator's record and/or exhibits
11/06/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/07/1997Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Beeman, Ex Parte Derrick JamesCriminal - AppellantBrenda Seale Gray
Trial Court Information
90th District Court
Young
Honorable V. Sue Koenig, Judge, 360th District Court
7177