judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 3rd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 03-96-00625-CV
03-96-00625-CV
11/07/1996
Summary judgment
Darrell and Betty McIntosh, as Next Friends of Scott Bradley McIntosh, a Minor
James Alexander, Ph.D.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/09/2005Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
11/29/1999Case stored
02/23/1998Mandate Issued
02/19/1998Case returned from higher court
12/11/1997Peition for Review disposed in Supreme CourtMotion or Writ Denied
09/15/1997Case forwarded to higher court
09/02/1997Petition for writ of mandamus
08/26/1997Mt for ext of time to file Petition for WritMotion or Writ Granted
07/24/1997Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
07/24/1997Motion for rehearing en bancOverruled
07/22/1997Response to Motion
07/10/1997miscellaneous motion dispMotion or Writ Granted
07/07/1997Affidavit filed
07/07/1997miscellaneous motion filed
06/30/1997Motion for rehearing en banc
06/30/1997Motion for rehearing filed
06/30/1997Motion for rehearing en banc received
06/30/1997Motion for Rehearing Received
06/12/1997Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/26/1997Submitted
03/26/1997Submission
02/13/1997Oral argument acknowledged
02/12/1997Oral argument acknowledged
01/31/1997Submission
01/16/1997Case ready to be set
01/06/1997Brief filed
12/12/1996Staff recommendation for mediationNo for mediation
12/12/1996Brief filed
12/09/1996Docketing statement or response
11/27/1996Docketing statement or response
11/14/1996ADR letter w/docketing statement
11/07/1996Transcript Filed
11/07/1996Transcript Received
11/07/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/23/1998Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Alexander, JamesAppelleeMr. John C. Wilson
Mcintosh, Darrell As Next FriAppellantMr. David R. Weiner
Ms. Paula Sweeney
Mcintosh, Betty As Next FrienAppellantMs. Paula Sweeney
Mr. David R. Weiner
Trial Court Information
261st District Court
Travis
Honorable John K. Dietz
92-02173B