judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-96-00914-CR
04-96-00914-CR
11/12/1996
Assault or Attempted Murder
Susanna Rodriguez
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/21/1998Mandate received by the trial court
05/15/1998Mandate Issued
05/15/1998Mandate Issued
02/27/1998Opinion issuedModified/Reformed and Affirmed
02/27/1998Opinion issuedModified/Reformed and Affirmed
10/31/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
10/31/1997Amended Brief Filed
10/06/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
10/06/1997Order Entered
10/06/1997Motion to Withdraw Counsel DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
09/19/1997Affidavit for Motion Filed
09/19/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
09/15/1997Motion to Withdraw Counsel Filed
09/08/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
09/08/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
09/08/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
09/08/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
09/08/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
09/08/1997Information regarding cause received
09/02/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
09/02/1997No Description Available.
09/02/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
09/02/1997No Description Available.
08/28/1997No New Event but Update in Calendar
07/31/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
07/31/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
07/31/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
07/31/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
07/31/1997Order Entered
06/03/1997Submitted
06/03/1997Submission
06/03/1997Submitted
05/27/1997Motion to Withdraw Counsel Filed
05/05/1997Waives Oral Argument
05/05/1997Submission
04/24/1997No New Event but Update in Calendar
04/24/1997Staff Attorney has been assigned to the case
04/04/1997Motion for Leave DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/04/1997Motion for Leave DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
03/31/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
03/31/1997Motion for Leave Filed
02/27/1997Brief Filed
02/27/1997Brief Recd (If in excess of page limit and/or late)
02/27/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
02/27/1997Requests Oral Argument
02/27/1997Motion for Leave Filed
02/26/1997Case ready to be set
02/26/1997Case ready to be set
01/17/1997Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/30/1996Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
12/19/1996Brief Filed
12/19/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
12/19/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
12/19/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
12/19/1996Brief Recd (If in excess of page limit and/or late)
11/12/1996No Description Available.
11/12/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
11/12/1996Exhibits Filed
11/12/1996No Description Available.
11/12/1996No Description Available.
11/12/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
09/16/1996Date of Sentencing in Trial Court
09/16/1996Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/15/1998Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Susanna RodriguezCriminal - AppellantAbelardo Garza
Susanna Rodriguez
Unknown UserINTERESTED PARTY
Unknown UserCriminal - State of TexasHeriberto Silva
Joe Mike Pena
Trial Court Information
229th Judicial District Court
Duval
Honorable Ricardo H. Garcia
5311
5 Years.