judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 12th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 12-96-00333-CR
12-96-00333-CR
11/12/1996
Revocation of Probation
Arnold, Jason M.
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/09/1998
02/04/1998Mandate Issued
02/04/1998Case stored
01/20/1998Petition for discretionary review was not filed
01/05/1998Motion for rehearing was not filed
12/19/1997Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/13/1997Submitted
11/13/1997Submission
10/17/1997Submission
04/28/1997Prescreened
04/21/1997Brief Filed
04/21/1997Case ready to be set
04/07/1997Brief Filed
03/03/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
02/18/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/23/1997
12/20/1996Motion or Writ Granted
12/02/1996motion for extension of time to file sfacts
11/25/1996No Description Available.
11/12/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
10/23/1996Notice of Appeal Filed
10/02/1996Date Sentence Given in Open Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/04/1998Case StoredCase stored
02/06/2023RetentionDate criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Unknown UserCriminal - State of TexasMr. Elmer C. Beckworth
Arnold, Jason M.Criminal - AppellantMs. Jo Al Cannon Sheridan
Trial Court Information
2nd District Court
Cherokee
Honorable Bascom W. Bentley
12579
10 yrs TDCJ